TN SB0418 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee with negative recommendation, as amended
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a task force to study the development of initiatives to reduce the waste of food in this state. - Amends TCA Title 53 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates a task force to study the development of initiatives to reduce the waste of food in this state. - Amends TCA Title 53 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateRefer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee with negative recommendation, as amended
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/20/2019
2019-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0355 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal. in Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback