TN SB0417 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits issuance of a permit, waiver, or variance to construct or expand a landfill within five miles of a residence; requires department of environment and conservation to organize meetings between violators and affected citizens upon the filing of a petition by such citizens to review violations and remedial actions. - Amends TCA Title 68 and Chapter 169 of the Private Acts of 1990.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits issuance of a permit, waiver, or variance to construct or expand a landfill within five miles of a residence; requires department of environment and conservation to organize meetings between violators and affected citizens upon the filing of a petition by such citizens to review violations and remedial actions. - Amends TCA Title 68 and Chapter 169 of the Private Acts of 1990.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0361 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback