TN SB0417 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits issuance of a permit, waiver, or variance to construct or expand a landfill within five miles of a residence; requires department of environment and conservation to organize meetings between violators and affected citizens upon the filing of a petition by such citizens to review violations and remedial actions. - Amends TCA Title 68 and Chapter 169 of the Private Acts of 1990.
Title
As introduced, prohibits issuance of a permit, waiver, or variance to construct or expand a landfill within five miles of a residence; requires department of environment and conservation to organize meetings between violators and affected citizens upon the filing of a petition by such citizens to review violations and remedial actions. - Amends TCA Title 68 and Chapter 169 of the Private Acts of 1990.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0361 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee