TN SB0416 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the requirement that a claimant for unemployment benefits be determined and certified as eligible for the three consecutive weeks following the initial waiting period. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 50, Chapter 7, relative to employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0564 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee