TN SB0416 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the commissioner of commerce and insurance to conduct a study to determine the amount of insurance policies that provide benefits for neurological disorders and the amount of claims for treatment of autism spectrum disorder within such policies; requires the commissioner to report to the commerce committees no later than January 1, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8 and Title 56.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the commissioner of commerce and insurance to conduct a study to determine the amount of insurance policies that provide benefits for neurological disorders and the amount of claims for treatment of autism spectrum disorder within such policies; requires the commissioner to report to the commerce committees no later than January 1, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8 and Title 56.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
2019-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0385 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-06 - Assigned to s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback