TN SB0413 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from March 1 to February 1, the date by which the executive director must file the annual report on commission-promulgated rules with the state and local government committee of the senate and the state government committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, relative to alcohol.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2022 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0836 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.