TN SB0413 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-04 - P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-04 - P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates office of solicitor general to defend and prosecute cases in the interest of the state in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 8.
Title
As introduced, creates office of solicitor general to defend and prosecute cases in the interest of the state in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 8.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0846 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-20 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0413&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0413.pdf |