TN SB0405 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, allows petitions for post-conviction relief based on new non-scientific evidence establishing that the petitioner is actually innocent of the offense for which the petitioner was convicted; establishes certain requirements for evidence on which such petitions are based. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 30, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, allows petitions for post-conviction relief based on new non-scientific evidence establishing that the petitioner is actually innocent of the offense for which the petitioner was convicted; establishes certain requirements for evidence on which such petitions are based. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 30, Part 1.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
2019-04-09SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/16/2019
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-03-26SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/9/2019
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-03-13SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0873 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-17 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback