TN SB0404 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 322
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 322
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows a retired law enforcement officer who fulfills the training and directive requirements or who is authorized to carry a firearm in the same manner as a law enforcement officer to provide private security services without completing the firearms training required for private protective services licensing. - Amends TCA Title 38 and Title 62, Chapter 35.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38 and Title 62, Chapter 35, relative to retired law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 322 | |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0412 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021