TN SB0401 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, adds a private process server to the list of individuals authorized to personally serve a copy of a warrant or summons on behalf of a landlord in an action for forcible entry and detainer to regain possession of such landlord's real property. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, adds a private process server to the list of individuals authorized to personally serve a copy of a warrant or summons on behalf of a landlord in an action for forcible entry and detainer to regain possession of such landlord's real property. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 18.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019
2019-03-26SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0033 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback