TN SB0399 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes it the duty of the state board of education to issue professional licenses upon the work done in standard teacher-training institutions, colleges, and universities that must be approved by the state board of education after inspection as may be provided by the board. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1 and Title 49, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, makes it the duty of the state board of education to issue professional licenses upon the work done in standard teacher-training institutions, colleges, and universities that must be approved by the state board of education after inspection as may be provided by the board. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1 and Title 49, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Pub. Ch. 19 | |
2017-04-04 | Effective date(s) 03/24/2017 | |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-03-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-03-13 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-03-13 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0049) |
2017-03-13 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-02-27 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0022) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/23/2017 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/15/2017 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0414 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 19