TN SB0397 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, decreases the time period a manufacturer may have license revoked from not less than one year to not greater than one year for violating the Tennessee Whiskey labeling and advertising requirements. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
As introduced, decreases the time period a manufacturer may have license revoked from not less than one year to not greater than one year for violating the Tennessee Whiskey labeling and advertising requirements. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/16/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to last calendar. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1289 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-14 - Withdrawn.