TN SB0396 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a retired member of the Tennessee consolidated retirement system to nominate a subsequent spouse to receive certain optional retirement allowances of the member upon the member's death. - Amends TCA Title 8.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a retired member of the Tennessee consolidated retirement system to nominate a subsequent spouse to receive certain optional retirement allowances of the member upon the member's death. - Amends TCA Title 8.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Deferred to Summer Study |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Rerefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Comm. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0839 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-29 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee