TN SB0389 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the City of McMinnville, by ordinance adopted by a two-thirds vote, to levy an occupancy tax of not more than 2.5 percent on the privilege of staying in any hotel or motel in McMinnville; the ordinance must set forth the manner of collection and administration of the privilege tax; requires that all proceeds received by the municipality from the tax be used for tourism development. - Amends amend TCA Section 67-4-1425.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the City of McMinnville, by ordinance adopted by a two-thirds vote, to levy an occupancy tax of not more than 2.5 percent on the privilege of staying in any hotel or motel in McMinnville; the ordinance must set forth the manner of collection and administration of the privilege tax; requires that all proceeds received by the municipality from the tax be used for tourism development. - Amends amend TCA Section 67-4-1425.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 165 | |
2017-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/24/2017 | |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 6, PNV 1 |
2017-04-13 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0122) |
2017-04-13 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-04-06 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0076) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/3/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0459 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 165