TN SB0388 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-31 - P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-31 - P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits an agency that has filed an emergency rule from filing a proposed rule on the same subject without first holding a public rulemaking hearing. - Amends TCA Section 4-5-202.
Title
As introduced, prohibits an agency that has filed an emergency rule from filing a proposed rule on the same subject without first holding a public rulemaking hearing. - Amends TCA Section 4-5-202.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Rep. Judd Matheny [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-31 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0812 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-06 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0388&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0388.pdf |