TN SB0385 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, excludes from the definition of marijuana a cannabidiol product approved as a prescription medication by the United States Food and Drug Administration. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-402.
Title
As enacted, excludes from the definition of marijuana a cannabidiol product approved as a prescription medication by the United States Food and Drug Administration. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-402.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Pub. Ch. 120 | |
2017-04-19 | Effective date(s) 04/12/2017 | |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-04-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-03-30 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2017-03-30 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-03-16 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/13/2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0694 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 120