TN SB0384 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises present law relative to a taxpayer's duty to list fully such tangible personal property used, or held for use, in the taxpayer's business or profession on such schedule, place its correct value thereon, sign the schedule, and return it to the assessor on or before March 1 of each year; requires TACIR to monitor implementation and to periodically report its findings on collections and administration of the business personal property tax to the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, relative to taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-17 Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
2023-05-17 Pub. Ch. 341
2023-05-05SenateSigned by Governor.
2023-04-24SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2023-04-21HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-04-21SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-04-21SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2023-04-20HousePassed H., Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 0
2023-04-20HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0131)
2023-04-20HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2023-04-03HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2023-03-31SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-30SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2023-03-30SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2023-03-30SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0241)
2023-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/30/2023
2023-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/27/2023
2023-03-21SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-21SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2023-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2023
2023-03-14SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2023
2023-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/14/2023
2023-03-06SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-01-26SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2023-01-25SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-24SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0804 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 341

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback