TN SB0384 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing expedited issuance of certain professional licenses for certain armed forces members and their spouses to instead exempt such persons from licensure in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 13; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 68, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing expedited issuance of certain professional licenses for certain armed forces members and their spouses to instead exempt such persons from licensure in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 13; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 68, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Amend# 1 by Bailey (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Amend# 1 by Bailey (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 195 | |
2019-05-01 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0221) |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0221) |
2019-04-08 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0103) |
2019-04-08 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0152) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0304 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 195