TN SB0382 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that at least one of the six educator members of the textbook commission be an employee of an LEA that consistently ranks among the state's top five LEAs based on enrollment. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires that at least one of the six educator members of the textbook commission be an employee of an LEA that consistently ranks among the state's top five LEAs based on enrollment. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Rep. Judd Matheny [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0817 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-06 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0382&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0382.pdf |