TN SB0381 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that the requirement for the department to assess the fiscal impact upon licensees of a change by the department of certain rules, regulations, policies, or guidelines also applies if affected licensees render services pursuant to agreements with TennCare or TennCare managed care organizations. - Amends TCA Title 33 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33 and Title 71, relative to services for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to 3/24/21 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1013 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-01 - Sponsor(s) Added.