TN SB0380 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes it a discriminatory practice for a person who is paying a non-employee for labor or services to engage in harassment of the non-employee because of the non-employee's sex; holds such persons liable for the actions of their employees in engaging in such harassment under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 50.
Title
As introduced, makes it a discriminatory practice for a person who is paying a non-employee for labor or services to engage in harassment of the non-employee because of the non-employee's sex; holds such persons liable for the actions of their employees in engaging in such harassment under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Deferred to Summer Study |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0387 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Def. to Summer Study in Employee Affairs Subcommittee