TN SB0377 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/13/2019
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/13/2019
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits use or sale of deer or elk urine originating in state or province with documented occurrences of chronic wasting disease. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 70, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, prohibits use or sale of deer or elk urine originating in state or province with documented occurrences of chronic wasting disease. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 70, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1201 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee