TN SB0376 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes from the commissioner of commerce and insurance the authority to impose a monitoring inspection fee on each manufactured home produced in this state. - Amends TCA Title 13; Title 45; Title 47; Title 55; Title 62; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, removes from the commissioner of commerce and insurance the authority to impose a monitoring inspection fee on each manufactured home produced in this state. - Amends TCA Title 13; Title 45; Title 47; Title 55; Title 62; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-04-02SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1361 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-18 - Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback