TN SB0375 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires commissioner of revenue to report in writing to the finance, ways and means committees of the senate and the house of representatives the total annual amount of industrial machinery franchise and excise tax credits for fiscal years 2016-2021. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21, relative to franchise and excise taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation, as amended |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1009 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee