TN SB0371 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes an LEA or public charter school to use TANF program funds to cover costs associated with programs that provide covered services to eligible students; requires the department to consult with the department of human services to determine which programs are eligible to be funded with TANF program funds; requires the department to publish a list of eligible programs on its website. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49 and Title 71, relative to TANF funds.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/15/2023 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0715 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-01 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration