TN SB0369 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a court, upon the request of a criminal defense attorney, to instruct the jury that although the state may prove a case beyond a reasonable doubt the jury may still find the defendant not guilty in order to avoid an unjust result. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires a court, upon the request of a criminal defense attorney, to instruct the jury that although the state may prove a case beyond a reasonable doubt the jury may still find the defendant not guilty in order to avoid an unjust result. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-03-12SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
2019-02-04SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0368 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback