TN SB0368 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes the statute of limitations for prosecution of certain Class A or Class B felony sex offenses committed against a child on or after July 1, 2019, and deletes a provision that sets a lower statute of limitations for aggravated rape, rape of a child, rape, and aggravated rape of a child if notice of the offense is not given to law enforcement within three years of the offense. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 2, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, removes the statute of limitations for prosecution of certain Class A or Class B felony sex offenses committed against a child on or after July 1, 2019, and deletes a provision that sets a lower statute of limitations for aggravated rape, rape of a child, rape, and aggravated rape of a child if notice of the offense is not given to law enforcement within three years of the offense. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 2, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/19/2019
2019-02-12SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/19/2019
2019-02-06SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/12/2019
2019-02-04SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0286 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback