TN SB0364 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, alters the boundary between Davidson and Wilson counties in such manner as to detach certain parcels of real property currently located in Davidson County and to attach such parcels to Wilson County.
Title
AN ACT relative to the boundary line between the counties of Davidson and Wilson.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Effective date(s) 01/01/2022 | |
2021-06-02 | Pub. Ch. 588 | |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-05-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed H., Ayes 82, Nays 4, PNV 0 |
2021-05-05 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0432 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 588