TN SB0360 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the medical laboratory board to standardize quality control and electronic recordkeeping for all medical laboratories by rule; specifies that the fees that must accompany a renewal application include reporting fees set by the board. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 68, relative to the Tennessee Medical Laboratory Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0579 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Failed in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee