TN SB0360 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Pub. Ch. 303
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, expands the Prevention of Youth Access to Tobacco and Vapor Products Act and other laws concerning juveniles' access to tobacco and vaping products to apply to hemp for smoking. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Section 68-1-132.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, expands the Prevention of Youth Access to Tobacco and Vapor Products Act and other laws concerning juveniles' access to tobacco and vaping products to apply to hemp for smoking. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Section 68-1-132.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR REREFER TO COMMITTEE PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13 Pub. Ch. 303
2019-05-13 Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
2019-05-08SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-04-30SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-29HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-29HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-25SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-24SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-23HousePassed H., Ayes 84, Nays 8, PNV 0
2019-04-22HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/19
2019-04-22HouseReset on next avail. cal.
2019-04-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-10HouseRe-ref. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-10HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-03-18HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-03-14SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-14SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2019-03-14SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0076)
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/14/2019
2019-03-05SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Sen. Cal. Comm Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
2019-02-26SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/5/2019
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
2019-02-04SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1284 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 303

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback