TN SB0355 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing redevelopment of brownfield sites in economically disadvantaged areas. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 53.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing redevelopment of brownfield sites in economically disadvantaged areas. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 53.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 257 | |
2019-05-09 | Effective date(s) 04/30/2019 | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-17 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0218) |
2019-04-17 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-17 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0131) |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/9/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee to 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0327 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 257