TN SB0352 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes an unfair or deceptive act or practice certain legal advertisements for claims related to medical devices and pharmaceuticals, and the unauthorized use or distribution of protected health information; creates penalties for violations; authorizes attorney general to enforce the provisions of the act. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 23 and Title 47, Chapter 18.
Title
As enacted, makes an unfair or deceptive act or practice certain legal advertisements for claims related to medical devices and pharmaceuticals, and the unauthorized use or distribution of protected health information; creates penalties for violations; authorizes attorney general to enforce the provisions of the act. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 23 and Title 47, Chapter 18.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] |
Sen. Steven Dickerson [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Pub. Ch. 119 | |
2019-04-15 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 2 (Amendment 1 - HA0076) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 3/25/2019 |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 85, Nays 6, PNV 3 |
2019-03-21 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0076) |
2019-03-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-02-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 24, Nays 6 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/25/2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0352 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 119