TN SB0349 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Pub. Ch. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, prohibits the dropping of items or substances from unmanned aircraft into an open-air event venue where more than 100 persons are gathered for a ticketed event; violation is Class C misdemeanor. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, prohibits the dropping of items or substances from unmanned aircraft into an open-air event venue where more than 100 persons are gathered for a ticketed event; violation is Class C misdemeanor. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Pub. Ch. 40
2019-04-03 Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
2019-03-22SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-03-15SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-03-13HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-03-12SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-03-08SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-03-07HousePassed H., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-03-07HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-02-25HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-02-21SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-02-21SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/21/2019
2019-02-12SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-02-06SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/12/2019
2019-02-04SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0154 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 40

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback