TN SB0340 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, excludes transit fare cards from the definition of "property" for purposes of the Uniform Unclaimed Property Act. - Amends TCA Section 66-29-102.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, excludes transit fare cards from the definition of "property" for purposes of the Uniform Unclaimed Property Act. - Amends TCA Section 66-29-102.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01 Pub. Ch. 11
2019-04-01 Effective date(s) 03/13/2019
2019-03-13SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-03-06SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-03-05HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-02-28SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-02-26SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-02-25HousePassed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-02-25HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-02-25SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-02-25SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/25/2019
2019-02-19SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-02-12SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/19/2019
2019-02-04SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0242 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 11

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback