TN SB0339 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the commissioner of correction to award certain inmates up to eight months of public health emergency credits for time served during a state of emergency declared by the governor due to a public health emergency based on communicable disease. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 40 and Title 41.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37; Title 40 and Title 41, relative to public health emergency credits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-26SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0735 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback