TN SB0332 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/13/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/13/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing certain tasting events. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, relative to alcohol.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/13/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 437 | |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-26 | House | Passed H., Ayes 82, Nays 8, PNV 2 |
2021-04-26 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0368) |
2021-04-26 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 0, PNV 3 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0216) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0668 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 437