TN SB0328 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee / no second
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Student Protection and Zone Equity Act." - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Section 49-2-116.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Student Protection and Zone Equity Act." - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Section 49-2-116.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateFailed in Senate Judiciary Committee / no second
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
2019-02-04SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0238 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-22 - Held on desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback