TN SB0324 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes law enforcement to scan driver's portable electronic device if officer has probable cause to believe driver was using device in violation of state law and driver was involved in an accident resulting in death or serious bodily injury; revises the description of the devices to which the prohibition on texting and driving apply. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55.
Title
As introduced, authorizes law enforcement to scan driver's portable electronic device if officer has probable cause to believe driver was using device in violation of state law and driver was involved in an accident resulting in death or serious bodily injury; revises the description of the devices to which the prohibition on texting and driving apply. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0854 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee