TN SB0323 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits registration plates to be renewed every 24 months instead of 12 months. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4 and Title 55, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 4 and Title 55, Chapter 6, relative to registration periods for license plates.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/14/2022 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/17/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1544 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-19 - Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee