TN SB0323 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 91
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 91
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates Hermitage Golf Course in Nashville-Davidson County as a premier type tourist resort for purposes of consuming alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Title
As enacted, designates Hermitage Golf Course in Nashville-Davidson County as a premier type tourist resort for purposes of consuming alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 91 | |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/11/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0058 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 91