TN SB0320 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 1/1/2022
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits a person from denying an individual the full and equal enjoyment of goods, services, facilities, privileges, advantages, and accommodations of a place of public accommodation, resort, or amusement on the grounds of the wearing or use of a medical device, or whether the individual has received medical treatment. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 58 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 58 and Title 68, relative to discrimination.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 1/1/2022
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/21/2021
2021-04-07SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/7/2021
2021-04-06SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to 4/7/2021
2021-03-30SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
2021-03-30SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/6/2021
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021
2021-03-23SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2021-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/23/2021
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-22SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0794 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-31 - Action Def. in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2022

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback