TN SB0320 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the public to access dashboard in the same manner as the general assembly; provided, that the information does not violate attorney-client privilege. - Amends TCA Title 3.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the public to access dashboard in the same manner as the general assembly; provided, that the information does not violate attorney-client privilege. - Amends TCA Title 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1074 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-15 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee