TN SB0320 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, rewrites Post-Mortem Examinations Act effective January 1, 2017; requires counties to appoint a medicolegal death investigator; terminates Tennessee medical examiner advisory council. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2; Title 38, Chapter 7 and Title 68, Chapter 1, Part 11.
Title
As introduced, rewrites Post-Mortem Examinations Act effective January 1, 2017; requires counties to appoint a medicolegal death investigator; terminates Tennessee medical examiner advisory council. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2; Title 38, Chapter 7 and Title 68, Chapter 1, Part 11.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0824) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/28/2016 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/21/2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/21/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/16/2016 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0289 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-12 - Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee