TN SB0318 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts medical laboratory personnel employed by privately owned labs while performing work at a medical laboratory from the requirements of the Tennessee Medical Laboratory Act. - Amends TCA Section 68-1-901; Title 68, Chapter 29 and Title 68, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, exempts medical laboratory personnel employed by privately owned labs while performing work at a medical laboratory from the requirements of the Tennessee Medical Laboratory Act. - Amends TCA Section 68-1-901; Title 68, Chapter 29 and Title 68, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0328 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee