TN SB0317 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that the definition of the practice of nursing does not prevent qualified registered nurses from making determinations that patients are experiencing emergency medical conditions, in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 7, Part 1 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that the definition of the practice of nursing does not prevent qualified registered nurses from making determinations that patients are experiencing emergency medical conditions, in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 7, Part 1 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Katrina Robinson [D] | Sen. Art Swann [R] |
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 1 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 1 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Pub. Ch. 12 | |
2019-04-01 | Effective date(s) 03/20/2019 | |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-03-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed H., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-03-07 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0015) |
2019-03-07 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0053) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/7/2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0199 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 12