TN SB0314 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, specifies that the entity responsible for the AED program is not civilly liable for any personal injury that results from an act or omission related to the use or maintenance of the AED that does not amount to willful or wanton misconduct or gross negligence. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 140, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, specifies that the entity responsible for the AED program is not civilly liable for any personal injury that results from an act or omission related to the use or maintenance of the AED that does not amount to willful or wanton misconduct or gross negligence. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 140, Part 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09 Pub. Ch. 61
2019-04-09 Effective date(s) 03/28/2019
2019-03-28SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-03-22SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-03-20HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-03-20SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-03-19SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-03-18HousePassed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-03-18HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0056)
2019-03-18HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-03-07HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-03-05SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-04SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-03-04SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0041)
2019-03-01SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/4/2019
2019-02-26SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
2019-02-12SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/26/2019
2019-02-06SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/12/2019
2019-02-04SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0775 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 61

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback