TN SB0313 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the executive director of the state museum to report to the chairs of the finance, ways and means committees of both houses detailing the fundraising activities of the state museum during the previous fiscal year; makes other revisions governing donations to the museum. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 10.
Title
As enacted, requires the executive director of the state museum to report to the chairs of the finance, ways and means committees of both houses detailing the fundraising activities of the state museum during the previous fiscal year; makes other revisions governing donations to the museum. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 10.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Pub. Ch. 81 | |
2019-04-09 | Effective date(s) 04/03/2019 | |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-03-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-03-14 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0040) |
2019-03-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-02-25 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0013) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/21/2019 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/13/2019 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0217 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 81