TN SB0310 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, directs the Tennessee School for the Deaf, together with the West Tennessee School for the Deaf, to establish a two-year deaf mentor pilot project to assist families and agencies in implementing bilingual and bicultural home-based programming for young children who are deaf, hard of hearing, or deaf-blind. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 10, Part 9.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, directs the Tennessee School for the Deaf, together with the West Tennessee School for the Deaf, to establish a two-year deaf mentor pilot project to assist families and agencies in implementing bilingual and bicultural home-based programming for young children who are deaf, hard of hearing, or deaf-blind. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 10, Part 9.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-03-06SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/6/2019
2019-02-04SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0567 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-17 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback