TN SB0307 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department to provide certain medical personnel who are residents of this state and who have provided healthcare services during the effective period of the state of emergency declared by the governor in Executive Order No. 14 on March 12, 2020, with a one-time stipend of $1,500. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to health care.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/21/2021
2021-04-07SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/7/2021
2021-04-06SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to 4/7/2021
2021-03-30SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
2021-03-30SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/6/2021
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021
2021-03-23SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/30/2021
2021-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/23/2021
2021-03-16SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/23/2021
2021-03-09SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/16/2021
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-22SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1596 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback