TN SB0307 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the sales tax exemption for purchases of textbooks to include purchases of reading materials required for high school or college classes. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, expands the sales tax exemption for purchases of textbooks to include purchases of reading materials required for high school or college classes. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee with negative recommendation |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0374 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee